No. 21-869
Title:Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Lynn Goldsmith, et al.
Docketed:December 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2420)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 12, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 12, 2022 to February 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 11, 2022.
Jan 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Copyright Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Barbara Kruger and Robert Storr filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Art Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 12 2022Brief amici curiae of The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation, Roy Lichtenstein Foundation, and Brooklyn Museum filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Brief of respondents Lynn Goldsmith, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Feb 23 2022Reply of petitioner The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022Petition GRANTED.
Apr 18 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Lynn Goldsmith, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.
Blanket Consent
May 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 10, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2022.
Jun 10 2022Brief of petitioner The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2022Joint appendix (Volumes I and II) filed. (Statement of cost filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, October, 12, 2022.
Jun 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Royal Manticoran Navy: The Official Honor Harrington Fan Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Art Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Floor64, Inc. d/b/a The Copia Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Authors Guild, Inc., et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Motion Picture Association, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Art Institute of Chicago, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Authors Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Library Futures Institute, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Association in suppoprt of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Art Professor Richard Meyer in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Artists Barbara Kruger, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Copyright Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Documentary Filmmakers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 2nd Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Lynn Goldsmith, et al.
Other
Lauren Beth Emerson
    Counsel of Record
Leason Ellis LLP
One Barker Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601

emerson@leasonellis.com
91428800222
Party name: American Intellectual Property Association
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation, et al.
Brian Michael Willen
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 999-5800
Party name: Barbara Kruger and Robert Storr
Mark A. Baghdassarian
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis and Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

MBaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com
2127159100
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Kyle Kenneth Courtney
    Counsel of Record
Harvard University
1 Harvard Yard, Widener G-20
Cambridge, MA 02138

kyle_courtney@harvard.edu
617-495-4089
Party name: Library Futures Institute, The Software Preservation Network, The EveryLibrary Institute, The American Library Association, The Association of College and Research Libraries, and The Association of Research Libraries
Caren Lerner Decter
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz PC
28 Liberty Street, 35th Floor
New York, NY 10005

cdecter@fkks.com
2127054833
Party name: Documentary Filmmakers
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: Art Professor Richard Meyer
Simon James Frankel
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
Salesforce Tower
415 Mission Street, Suite 5400
San Fransisco, CA 94105-2533

sfrankel@cov.com
415-591-7052
Party name: Art Institute of Chicago, et al.
Catherine Rachel Gellis
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
3020 Bridgeway #247
Sausalito, CA 94965

cathy@cgcounsel.com
2026422849
Party name: Floor64, Inc. d/b/a The Copia Institute
Remy Green
    Counsel of Record
Cohen&Green P.L.L.C.
1639 Centre St., Suite 216
Ridgewood, NY 11385

remy@femmelaw.com
19298889480
Party name: ROYAL MANTICORAN NAVY: THE OFFICIAL HONOR HARRINGTON FAN ASSOCIATION, INC.
Susan J. Kohlmann
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1155 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

skohlmann@jenner.com
212-891-1600
Party name: Copyright Alliance
Eleanor Martine Lackman
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
437 Madison Avenue
25th Floor
New York, NY 10022

eml@msk.com
(212) 878-4890
Party name: Authors Guild, Inc., News Media Alliance, Sesame Workshop, Inc., Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, Romance Writers of America, Sisters in Crime, and Garden Communicators International
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

mlemley@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: Art Law Professors
Corynne McSherry
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

corynne@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Organization For Transformative Works
Erik Robert Stallman
    Counsel of Record
587 Simon Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

estallman@law.berkeley.edu
5106422485
Party name: Authors Alliance
Rebecca Leah Tushnet
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1575 Massachusetts Ave.
Hauser 520
Cambridge, MA 02138

rtushnet@law.harvard.edu
(703) 593-6759
Party name: Copyright Law Professors
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: The Motion Picture Association, Inc.