No. 21-867
Title:Midwest Air Traffic Control Service, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Jessica T. Badilla, et al.
Docketed:December 10, 2021
Linked with 21A95
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-608)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2021Application (21A95) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 7, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Application (21A95) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 8, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Midwest Air Traffic Control Service, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jan 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent Jessica T. Badilla, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 10 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Professional Services Council.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 24 2022Response Requested. (Due February 23, 2022)
Jan 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 23, 2022 to March 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2022.
Mar 24 2022Brief of respondents Jessica T. Badilla, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 13 2022Reply of petitioner Midwest Air Traffic Control Service, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Midwest Air Traffic Control Service, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Jessica T. Badilla, et al.
Thomas P. RouthNolan Law Group
20 N. Clark - 30th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

tpr@nolan-law.com
312-630-4000
Party name: Jessica T. Badilla, et al.
Other
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jennifer Stacey Zucker
    Counsel of Record
GreenbergTraurig LLP
2101 L St., NW
Washington, DC 20037

zuckerjs@gtlaw.com
2023313114
Party name: Professional Services Council