No. 21-86
Title:Axon Enterprise, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Federal Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-15662)
   Decision Date:January 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Axon Enterprise, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2021 to September 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 22, 2021.
Sep 22 2021Brief of respondents Federal Trade Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 06 2021Reply of petitioner Axon Enterprise, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 01 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 08 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 15 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 01 2021Rescheduled.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 07 2021Rescheduled.
Dec 20 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Axon Enterprise, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 06 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Feb 03 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 9, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2022.
Mar 23 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Axon Enterprise, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Mar 25 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Federal Trade Commission, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 04 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Axon Enterprise, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 09 2022Brief of petitioner Axon Enterprise, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Separation of Powers Clinic at Antonin Scalia Law School filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Hospital Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Committee For Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Justice Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2022Letter of the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties in No. 21-86, Axon Enterprise, Inc. v. FTC, and No. 21-1239, SEC v. Cochran, regarding alignment of parties and briefing filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Upon consideration of the letter of May 19, 2022, from the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties in No. 21-86 and No. 21-1239, respondent in No. 21-1239 has to and including June 30, 2022, within which to file the joint appendix and the opening brief on the merits in No. 21-1239. The Solicitor General has to and including August 8, 2022, within which to file a consolidated response brief on the merits on behalf of the federal parties in No. 21-86 and No. 21-1239, limited to 20,000 words.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
2027428900
Party name: Axon Enterprise, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Trade Commission, et al.
Other
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Committee For Justice
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
John Kerkhoff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201

JKerkhoff@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Antonin Scalia Law School/George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: Separation of Powers Clinic at Antonin Scalia Law School
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Holly Anne Pierson
    Counsel of Record
Pierson Law LLC
2951 Piedmont Road NE
Suite 200
Atlanta, GA 30305

hpierson@piersonlawllc.com
4043532316
Party name: The Justice Society
Julie Marie Wilson
    Counsel of Record
800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

Julie.Wilson@nteu.org
2025725586
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union
Mark Remy Yohalem
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
633 West Fifth Street
Suite 1550
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mark.yohalem@wsgr.com
323-210-2958
Party name: American Hospital Association