No. 21-857
Title:Marcus Deangelo Jones, Petitioner
v.
Dewayne Hendrix, Warden
Docketed:December 9, 2021
Linked with 21A117
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1286)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2021Application (21A117) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2021 to December 9, 2021, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Application (21A117) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 9, 2021.
Dec 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Dewayne Hendrix, Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 29 2021Response Requested. (Due January 28, 2022)
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2022 to February 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2022.
Feb 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2022 to March 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 30, 2022.
Mar 30 2022Brief of respondent Dewayne Hendrix, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2022Reply of petitioner Marcus DeAngelo Jones filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jun 02 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Marcus DeAngelo Jones
Blanket Consent
Jun 17 2022Letter of the Solicitor General notifying the Court that government will defend the judgment but not the rationale of the court of appeals' decision. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 14, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 12, 2022.
Jun 28 2022Morgan L. Ratner, Esquire, of Washington, D. C., is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Jul 14 2022Brief of petitioner Marcus DeAngelo Jones filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2022Joint appendix filed (statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Habeas Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, November 1, 2022.
Aug 08 2022Brief of respondent Dewayne Hendrix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 31 2022CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Sep 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2022Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dro@virginia.edu
4349243127
Party name: Marcus DeAngelo Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Dewayne Hendrix
Other
Shelley Marie Fite
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public and Community Defenders
22 E. Mifflin Street
Suite 1000
Madison, WI 53703

shelley_fite@fd.org
6082340883
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Morgan L. Ratner
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
1700 New York Avenue, N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006-5215

ratnerm@sullcrom.com
202-956-7500
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Gregory Silbert
    Counsel of Record
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

gregory.silbert@weil.com
(212) 310-8846
Party name: Habeas Scholars
Kendall Kelly Alexis Turner
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

kendallturner@omm.com
202-383-5204
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, The American Civil Liberties Union, and The Arkansas Civil Liberties Foundation