No. 21-838
Vide 21-840
Title:Penobscot Nation, Petitioner
v.
Aaron M. Frey, Attorney General of Maine, et al.
Docketed:December 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1424, 16-1435, 16-1474, 16-1482)
   Decision Date:July 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of National Congress of American Indians and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2022 to March 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2022, for all respondents.
Jan 06 2022Waiver of right of respondents Town of East Millinocket; Guilford-Sangerville Sanitary District; Town of Howland; Town of Lincoln; Lincoln Sanitary District; Town of Mattawamkeag; Town of Millinocket; Veazie Sewer District to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Maine Indian Tribal-State Commission filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of the Congressional Native American Caucus filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Penobscot Nation
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua Dale Dunlap
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Atwood LLP
254 Commercial Street
Portland, ME 04101

jdunlap@pierceatwood.com
12077911100
Party name: Town of East Millinocket; Guilford-Sangerville Sanitary District; Town of Howland; Town of Lincoln; Lincoln Sanitary District; Town of Mattawamkeag; Town of Millinocket; Veazie Sewer District
Kimberly Leehaug Patwardhan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Maine Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

kimberly.patwardhan@maine.gov
2076268570
Party name: State of Maine, Aaron M. Frey, Judy A. Camuso, Dan Scott
Other
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Members of the Congressional Native American Caucus
Daniel David Lewerenz
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1514 P Street NW, Suite D
Washington, DC 20005

lewerenz@narf.org
2027854166
Party name: National Congress of American Indians and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund
Luke A. Sobota
    Counsel of Record
Three Crowns LLP
3000 K St NW Ste 101
Washington, DC 20007

luke.sobota@threecrownsllp.com
202-540-9477
Party name: The Maine Indian Tribal-State Commission