No. 21-82
Title:Alpine Securities Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:July 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3272)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 19, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 20, 2021 to September 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 20, 2021.
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Former FinCEN Officials James H. Freis, Jr. and Charles M. Steele filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of CATO Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 20, 2021 to October 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 20, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: Alpine Securities Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: Former FinCEN Officials James H. Freis, Jr. and Charles M. Steele
Russell Gerard Ryan
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

rryan@kslaw.com
(202) 737-0500
Party name: CATO Institute