No. 21-806
Title:Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ivanka Talevski, Personal Representative of the Estate of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased
Docketed:December 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1664)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 25, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Waiver of right of respondent Gorgi Talevski, by his next friend Ivanka Talevski to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 03 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Brief amici curiae of American Health Care Association and Indiana Health Care Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Response Requested. (Due February 9, 2022)
Jan 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2022 to March 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2022.
Mar 01 2022Motion under Rule 35.1 filed to substitute Ivanka Talevski, as authorized representative, as respondent in place of Gorgi Talevski, deceased.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2022Brief of respondent Gorgi Talevski, by his next friend Ivanka Talevski in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2022Reply of petitioners Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 12 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Motion to substitute Ivanka Talevski, as authorized representative, as respondent in place of Gorgi Talevski, deceased GRANTED.
May 02 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 05 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Ivanka Talevski, Authorized Representative of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased
Blanket Consent
May 05 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 06 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 18, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 16, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Robbins Russell
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@kramerlevin.com
(202) 775-4501
Party name: Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Ivanka Talevski, Personal Representative of the Estate of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alaska, Arkansas, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, New Hampshire, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
James F. Segroves
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005-3373

jsegroves@reedsmith.com
2024149294
Party name: American Health Care Association and Indiana Health Care Association