No. 21-80
Title:Outdoor Amusement Business Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:July 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2370)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 16, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 20, 2021 to September 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 20, 2021.
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 20, 2021 to September 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 29, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Leon R. Sequeira
    Counsel of Record
616 South Adams Street
Arlington, VA 22204

lsequeira@lrs-law.com
2022559023
Party name: Outdoor Amusement Business Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.