No. 21-796 | |
Title: | Marchand & Rossi, L.L.P., nka Marchand Law, L.L.P., Petitioner v. Bryan K. White, et al. |
Docketed: | November 30, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-11309) |
Decision Date: | July 30, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 26, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 24 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2021 | Waiver of right of respondents Goodwin Hospice, LLC; Phoenix Hospice, Inc.; International Tutoring Services, LLC, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 16 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Suresh Kumar, R.N. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 16 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Vinayaka Associates, L.L.C. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 16 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Bryan White to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 21 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Excel Plus Home Health, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 21 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Be Gentle Home Health, Incorporated, doing business as Phoenix Home Health Care to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 05 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022. |
Jan 19 2022 | Response Requested. (Due February 18, 2022) |
Feb 03 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2022 to March 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 04 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2022, for all respondents. |
Mar 04 2022 | Brief of respondents Goodwin Hospice, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 18 2022 | Reply of petitioner Marchand & Rossi, L.L.P., now known as Marchand Law, L.L.P. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022. |
Apr 18 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Nolan C. Knight Counsel of Record | Munsch Hardt Kopf and Harr, P.C. 3800 Ross Tower 500 North Akard, Suite 3800 Dallas, TX 75201 nknight@munsch.com | (214) 855-7500 |
Party name: Marchand & Rossi, L.L.P., now known as Marchand Law, L.L.P. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Michael E. Clark Counsel of Record | Baker Donelson 1301 McKinney Street Suite 3700 Houston, TX 77010 mclark@bakerdonelson.com | 7132107413 |
Party name: Vinayaka Associates, L.L.C. | ||
Andrew Wade Guthrie Counsel of Record | Haynes and Boone, LLP 2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700 Dallas, TX 75219 andrew.guthrie@haynesboone.com | (214) 651-5821 |
Party name: Goodwin Hospice, LLC; Phoenix Hospice, Inc.; International Tutoring Services, LLC, et al. | ||
Dan Calvin Guthrie Jr. Counsel of Record | Guthrie 4131 North Central Expressway Suite 900 Dallas, TX 75204 Dan@WhiteCollarDefense.com | 214-953-1000 |
Party name: Suresh Kumar, R.N. | ||
Sidney Michael McColloch Counsel of Record | S. Michael McColloch, PLLC 6060 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500 Dallas, TX 75206 smm@mccolloch-law.com | 2146741868 |
Party name: Bryan White | ||
Lurese A. Terrell Counsel of Record | Kennedy Attorneys & Counselors at Law 12222 Merit Drive, Suite 1750 Dallas, TX 75251 lurese@markkennedylaw.com | 2144450740 |
Party name: Excel Plus Home Health, Inc. | ||
Jeffrey T Hall | Jeffrey T. Hall, Attorney at a Law 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4750 Dallas, TX 75201 jthallesq@gmail.com | 214-635-1839 |
Party name: Be Gentle Home Health, Incorporated, doing business as Phoenix Home Health Care |