No. 21-783
Title:Patsy K. Cope, et al., Petitioners
v.
Leslie W. Cogdill, et al.
Docketed:November 24, 2021
Linked with 21A81
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10798)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2021Application (21A81) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 11, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 21 2021Application (21A81) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 13, 2021.
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Leslie W. Cogdill, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Disability Rights Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2021Response Requested. (Due January 27, 2022)
Jan 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2022 to February 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Patsy K. Cope, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jon Mark Hogg
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
136 W. Twohig Ste B
San Angelo, TX 76903

jmhogg@jw.com
3254812560
Party name: Leslie W. Cogdill, et al.
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute, Law Enforcement Action Partnership, and Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Lisa Ann Snead
    Counsel of Record
Disability Rights Texas
2222 W. Braker Lane
Austin, TX 78758

lsnead@disabilityrightstx.org
5124072712
Party name: Disability Rights Texas