No. 21-778
Title:Selina Marie Ramirez, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jeremias Guadarrama, et al.
Docketed:November 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10055)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 25, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2021 to January 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2022, for all respondents.
Dec 23 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Brief of respondent Jeremias Guadarrama in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Brief of respondent Ebony N. Jefferson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 09 2022Reply of petitioners Selina Ramirez, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 01 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 15 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 22 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 28 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 12 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 19 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 25 2022Rescheduled.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 10 2022Rescheduled.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 16 2022Rescheduled.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 23 2022Rescheduled.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
May 31 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 06 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 13 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 23 2022Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Selina Ramirez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Edwin Armstrong Price Voss Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brown & Hofmeister, LLP
740 East Campbell Road
Suite 800
Richardson, TX 75081

evoss@bhlaw.net
12146821900
Party name: Jeremias Guadarrama
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute, Law Enforcement Action Partnership, and Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center