No. 21-767 | |
Title: | Clinton Williams, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | November 23, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1153) |
Decision Date: | August 25, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 19 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2021 to January 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2022. |
Dec 21 2021 | Brief amici curiae of FAMM and NACDL filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 24 2022 | Memorandum for the United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022. |
Feb 28 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John Gleeson Counsel of Record | Debevoise & Plimpton LLP 919 Third Avenue New York, NY 10022 jgleeson@debevoise.com | 212-909-6000 |
Party name: Clinton Williams | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Joshua Adam Matz Counsel of Record | Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP 350 Fifth Avenue, 63rd Floor New York, NY 10118 jmatz@kaplanhecker.com | (212) 763-0883 |
Party name: FAMM and NACDL |