No. 21-764 | |
Title: | Patrick Huff, Petitioner v. Florida |
Docketed: | November 23, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District |
Case Numbers: | (4D19-3750) |
Decision Date: | March 3, 2021 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | June 21, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 18 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 17 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 20 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Florida to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 22 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. |
Dec 23 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Justin Murray and Jocelyn Simonson filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 27 2021 | Response Requested. (Due January 26, 2022) |
Jan 11 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2022 to February 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 25, 2022. |
Feb 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2022 to March 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 25, 2022. |
Mar 25 2022 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 12 2022 | Reply of petitioner Patrick Huff filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 13 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022. |
May 02 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Devi Maheswari Rao Counsel of Record | Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center 501 H St. NE Suite 275 Washington, DC 20002 devi.rao@macarthurjustice.org | 202-869-3490 |
Party name: Patrick Huff | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Henry Charles Whitaker Counsel of Record | Florida Office of the Attorney General PL-01 The Capitol Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050 henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com | 8504143688 |
Party name: State of Florida | ||
Other | ||
Tassity Shardae Johnson Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Avenue NW Washington, CA 20001 tjohnson@jenner.com | 202-637-6303 |
Party name: Law Professors Justin Murray and Jocelyn Simonson | ||
David A. Schulz Counsel of Record | Media Freedom and Information Access Clinic, Abrams Institute, Yale Law School 127 Wall Street New Haven, CT 06511 david.schulz@yale.edu | (203) 432-4992 |
Party name: Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression |