No. 21-763
Title:John Forrest Ham, Jr., Petitioner
v.
M. Breckon, Warden
Docketed:November 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6972)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 21, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2021 to January 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2022.
Dec 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 24, 2022 to February 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 24, 2022.
Feb 24 2022Brief of respondent M. Breckon, Warden in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 16 2022Reply of petitioner John Forrest Ham, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: John Forrest Ham, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: M. Breckon, Warden
Other
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Stekloff LLP
2001 M Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonstekloff.com
2028474046
Party name: Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic