No. 21-757
Title:Amgen Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Sanofi, et al.
Docketed:November 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1074)
   Decision Date:February 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 21, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 22, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Association of University Technology Managers, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of GlaxoSmithKline plc filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 11 2022Response Requested. (Due February 10, 2022)
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2022 to March 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2022.
Mar 14 2022Brief of respondents Sanofi, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2022Reply of petitioners Amgen Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Sep 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners Amgen Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 04 2022Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Nov 29 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Sanofi, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 01 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Amgen Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 13 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 27, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including February 3, 2023.
Dec 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Amgen Inc., et al.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 27 2022Brief of petitioners Amgen Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chemistry and the Law Division of the American Chemical Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Diversified Researchers and Innovators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Fynder Group, Inc. d/b/a Nature’s Fynd filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amici curiae of REGENXBIO Inc., et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of Instil Bio, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of GlaxoSmithKline plc filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of AbbVie Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amici curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Motion of Chemistry and the Law Division of the American Chemical Society for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Alliance of U.S. Startups and Inventors for Jobs (USIJ), et al. (1/5/2023) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2023Response to motion from petitioners Amgen Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 27, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Amgen Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Sanofi, et al.
George William Hicks Jr.Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

george.hicks@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Sanofi, et al.
Victoria Lynne ReinesArnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

VICTORIA.REINES@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
2029426861
Party name: Sanofi, et al.
Daniel Louis ReisnerArnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019

DANIEL.REISNER@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
16463410237
Party name: Sanofi, et al.
Matthew McManus WolfArnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

MATTHEW.WOLF@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
(202) 942-5462
Party name: Sanofi, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
John M. Desmarais
    Counsel of Record
Desmarais LLP
230 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10169

jdesmarais@desmaraisllp.com
212-351-3400
Party name: GSK PLC
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-559-9175
Party name: The Fynder Group, Inc. d/b/a Nature’s Fynd
Melvin C. Garner
    Counsel of Record
Leason Ellis LLP
One Barker Avenue
Fifth Floor
White Plains, NY 10601

Garner@Leasonellis.com
(914) 288-0022
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Justin James Hasford
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett and Dunner, LLP
901 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

justin.hasford@finnegan.com
202-408-4175
Party name: Chemistry and the Law Division of the American Chemical Society
Louis James Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Hoffman Patent Firm
7689 East Paradise Lane
Suite 2
Scottsdale, AZ 85260-1691

louis@valuablepatents.com
4809483295
Party name: National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc.
William G. Jenks
    Counsel of Record
Jenks IP Law
1610 Allen St
Reno, NV 89509

wjenks@jenksiplaw.com
2024127964
Party name: Regenxbio Inc., IGM Biosciences, Inc., Adaptive Phage Therapeutics, Inc.
Jeffrey P. Kushan
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jkushan@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: diversified researchers and innovators
John Randolph Labbe
    Counsel of Record
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP
233 S. Wacker Drive, 6300 Willis Tower
Chicago, IL 60606-6357

jlabbe@marshallip.com
312-474-9579
Party name: Instil Bio, Inc.
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mlemley@law.stanford.edu
650-723-4605
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: AbbVie Inc.
Charles W. Shifley
    Counsel of Record
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
71 S. Wacker Drive, 36th Floor
Chicago, IL 60606

cshifley@bannerwitcoff.com
312-463-5000
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Robert P. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
RPT Legal Strategies PC
2443 Fillmore Street, Suite 332
San Francisco, CA 94115

robert.taylor@rptstrategies.com
(650) 400-6995
Party name: Alliance of U.S. Startups and Inventors for Jobs and and Innovation Alliance
John D. Vandenberg
    Counsel of Record
Klarquist Sparkman, LLP
121 S.W. Salmon Street
Suite 1000
Portland, OR 97204

john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
503-595-5300
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance and The Computer & Communications Industry Association
Vanessa Y. Yen
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas, 34th Floor
New York, NY 10036

vyen@kslaw.com
2122182212
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association