No. 21-742
Title:Lyft, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Million Seifu
Docketed:November 18, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B301774)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 18, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Felix Shafir
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz and Levy LLP
3601 West Olive Avenue
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505-4681

fshafir@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Lyft Inc.