No. 21-735 | |
Title: | Jim Olive Photography, dba Photolive, Inc., Petitioner v. University of Houston System |
Docketed: | November 17, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Texas |
Case Numbers: | (19-0605) |
Decision Date: | June 18, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 15 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 17, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 22 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent University of Houston System to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. |
Dec 08 2021 | Response Requested. (Due January 7, 2022) |
Dec 20 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 21 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2022. |
Feb 07 2022 | Brief of respondent University of Houston System in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 21 2022 | Reply of petitioner Jim Olive Photography filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022. |
Mar 21 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Owen Joseph McGovern Counsel of Record | Beck Redden LLP 1221 McKinney St., Suite 4500 Houston, TX 77010 omcgovern@beckredden.com | 713.951.6210 |
Party name: Jim Olive Photography, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Judd Edward Stone II Counsel of Record | Texas Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 judd.stone@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: University of Houston System |