No. 21-721
Title:Transpacific Steel LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:November 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2157)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2021 to January 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 18, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julie Clark Mendoza
    Counsel of Record
Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP
1401 Eye Street, NW Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jmendoza@mmmlaw.com
12022164817
Party name: Transpacific Steel LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.