No. 21-717
Title:John Does 1–3, et al., Petitioners
v.
Janet T. Mills, Governor of Maine, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Linked with 21A90
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1826)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2021Application (21A90) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 20 2021Response to application (21A90) requested by Justice Breyer, due Monday, October 25, by noon.
Oct 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by religious and civil rights organizations.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Response to application from respondents MaineHealth, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 25 2021Response to application from respondents Janet T. Mills, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Reply of applicants John Does 1-3, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Application (21A90) referred to the Court.
Oct 29 2021Application (21A90) denied by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to JUSTICE BREYER and by him referred to the Court is denied. JUSTICE BARRETT, with whom JUSTICE KAVANAUGH joins, concurring in the denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE GORSUCH, with whom JUSTICE THOMAS and JUSTICE ALITO join, dissenting from the denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion).
Nov 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners John Does 1–3, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2021Response to motion from respondents Janet T. Mills, Jeanne M. Lambrew, Nirav D. Shah filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2021Response to motion from respondents MaineHealth; Genesis HealthCare of Maine LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 24 2021The motions to extend the time to file responses are denied
Nov 24 2021Reply in support of motion to expedite consideration of petition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: John Does 1–3, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan Patrick Dumais
    Counsel of Record
Eaton Peabody
77 Sewall Street, Suite 3000
Augusta, ME 04332-5249

rdumais@eatonpeabody.com
(207) 622-3747
Party name: Northern Light Health Foundation
Kimberly Leehaug Patwardhan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Maine Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

kimberly.patwardhan@maine.gov
2076268570
Party name: Janet T. Mills, Jeanne M. Lambrew, Nirav D. Shah
Nolan Ladislav Reichl
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Atwood LLP
Merrill's Wharf, 254 Commercial Street
Portland, ME 04101

nreichl@pierceatwood.com
207-791-1304
Party name: MaineHealth; Genesis HealthCare of Maine LLC; Genesis HealthCare LLC; MaineGeneral Health