No. 21-711
Title:Markham Concepts, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Hasbro, Inc., et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1927)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hasbro, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent Reuben Klamer to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 01 2021Waiver of right of respondents Dawn Linkletter Griffin, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Markham Concepts, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
315 South Calhoun Street, Suite 600
Tallahassee, FL 32301

Amit.Agarwal@hklaw.com
850-425-5611
Party name: Hasbro, Inc.
David Bergstrand Jinkins
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Coburn LLP
One U.S. Bank Plaza
St. Louis, MO 63101

djinkins@thompsoncoburn.com
3145526304
Party name: Dawn Linkletter Griffin, et al.
Erica Jean Pruetz Van Loon
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4100
Los Angeles, CA 90071

evanloon@nixonpeabody.com
3107401565
Party name: Reuben Klamer