No. 21-707
Vide 20-1199
Title:Students for Fair Admissions, Inc., Petitioner
v.
University of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2263)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 11 2021Motion to expedite briefing of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed by petitioner Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Motion of The University of North Carolina et al. to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Response to motion to expedite from respondent The University of North Carolina et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 19 2021Motion of Cecilia Polanco, et al. to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Response to motion to expedite from respondent Cecilia Polanco, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Reply in Support of Motion to Expedite and Opposition to Motions for an Extension filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2021The motion of The University of North Carolina, et al. to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2021.
Nov 22 2021The motion of Cecilia Polanco, et al. to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Californians for Equal Rights Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor David Bernstein filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Officials of the Department of Education's Office for Civil Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Asian American Coalition for Education and the Asian American Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Speech First and Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2021Brief of respondents Cecilia Polanco, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Brief of respondents University respondents in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 23 2021Reply of petitioner Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-1199 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 24 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1199. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1199. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
David G. Hinojosa
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K. St. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

dhinojosa@lawyerscommittee.org
2026628307
Party name: Cecilia Polanco, et al.
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice - Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: The University of North Carolina et al.
Other
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
William Alan Jacobson
    Counsel of Record
18 Maple Ave #280
Barrington, RI 02806

contact@legalinsurrection.com
4012464192
Party name: Legal Insurrection Foundation
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Speech First and Southeastern Legal Foundation
Wencong Fa
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation, Chinese American Citizens Alliance - Greater New York, Yi Fang Chen, Coalition for TJ, and Project 21
Gordon M. Fauth Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Litigation Law Group
1935 Addison St., Ste. A
Berkeley, CA 94704

gmf@classlitigation.com
5102389610
Party name: Asian American Coalition for Education and the Asian American Legal Foundation
Cory Ren Liu
    Counsel of Record
Ashcroft Law Firm LLC
919 Congress, Ste 1325
Austin, TX 78701

cliu@ashcroftlawfirm.com
512-370-1800
Party name: Professor David Bernstein
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Daniel Isaac Morenoff
    Counsel of Record
The Equal Voting Rights Institute d/b/a The American Civil Rights Projects
P.O. Box 12207
Dallas, TX 75225

dan@americancivilrightsproject.org
(214) 504-1835
Party name: Californians for Equal Rights Foundation
T. Russell Nobile
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
P.O. Box 6592
Gulfport, Mississippi, MS 39506

rnobile@judicialwatch.org
202-527-9866
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation (“AEF”)
Dennis J. Saffran
    Counsel of Record
Dennis Saffran, Attorney at Law
38-18 West Drive
Douglaston, NY 11363

djsaffranlaw@gmail.com
718-428-7156
Party name: National Association of Scholars
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
William E. Trachman
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Former Federal Officials of the Department of Education's Office for Civil Rights