No. 21-706
Vide 21-605
Title:Joel Iverson Gilbert, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14654)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Paul Doss
    Counsel of Record
Lightfoot, Franklin & White, LLC
400 20th Street, North
Birmingham, AL 35023

jdoss@lightfootlaw.com
2055810700
Party name: Joel Gilbert
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America