No. 21-692
Title:Sergeant Haystings, et al., Petitioners
v.
Albert B. Korb
Docketed:November 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2826)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2021 to February 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sean Andrew Kirkpatrick
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth
Strawberry Square
15th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17120

skirkpatrick@attorneygeneral.gov
717-705-2331
Party name: Sgt. Haystings, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Cira Centre
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
2022613378
Party name: Albert Korb