No. 21-6916 | |
Title: | Joachim Martillo, Petitioner v. Twitter, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | January 20, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1921) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 07 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 22, 2022) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Mar 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022. |
Mar 28 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Joachim Carlo Santos Martillo | 75 Bailey St. Ste. 1L Boston, MA 02124 | (617) 276-5788 |
Party name: Joachim Martillo |