No. 21-683
Title:John C. Kitchin, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2072)
   Decision Date:July 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2021 to January 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: John C. Kitchin, Jr., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
William G. Beck
    Counsel of Record
Lathrop GPM LLP
2345 Grand Boulevard
Suite 2200
Kansas City, MO 64108

william.beck@lathropgpm.com
8164605811
Party name: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, et al.