No. 21-682
Title:Mackie L. Shivers, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12493)
   Decision Date:June 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Motion of United States for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lindsey C Boney IV
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203

lboney@bradley.com
2055218914
Party name: MACKIE L. SHIVERS, JR.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States