No. 21-68
Title:Brendon Janis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1077)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 18, 2021 to September 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 17, 2021.
Sep 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 17, 2021 to October 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 18, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Brendon Janis
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States