No. 21-679 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tim Shoop, Warden, Petitioner
v.
August Cassano
Docketed:November 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3761)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop