No. 21-676
Title:Susan K. Musta, Petitioner
v.
Mendota Heights Dental Center, et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A20-1551)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 14, 2022.
Dec 06 2021Brief amici curiae of Empire State NORML, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 14 2022Brief of respondents Mendota Heights Dental Center, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Reply of petitioner Susan K. Musta filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Susan K. Musta
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan M. Freiman
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin & Dana LLP
One Century Tower
P.O. Box 1832
New Haven, CT 06508-1832

jfreiman@wiggin.com
203-498-4584
Party name: Mendota Heights Dental Center, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Clifford Holland
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David Clifford Holland, P.C.
201 East 28th Street - Suite 2R
New York, NY 10016

DCH@HollandLitigation.com
2128422480
Party name: Empire State NORML, New York State affiliate of the National Organization for the Reform of Marijuana Laws (NORML), New York City Cannabis Industry Association (NYCCIA), and Hudson Valley Cannabis Industry Association (HVCIA)