No. 21-674
Title:North Carolina State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees, Petitioner
v.
Maxwell Kadel, et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1409)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2021 to January 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Response of North Carolina State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees to motion submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Guyton Knepper Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John G. Knepper, LLC
1720 Carey Avenue, Suite 590
Cheyenne, WY 82001

John@KnepperLLC.com
307-632-2842
Party name: North Carolina State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees
Attorneys for Respondents
Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
120 Wall Street, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10005

ogonzalez-pagan@lambdalegal.org
6463077406
Party name: Maxwell Kadel, et al.