No. 21-6693
Title:Joey Rogers, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:December 21, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-504)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 1, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Jan 13 2022Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 24 2022Response Requested. (Due February 23, 2022)
Feb 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 23, 2022 to March 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2022.
Mar 25 2022Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 22 2022Record Requested.
Apr 25 2022Record received from the Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Third Circuit. The record is electronic.
May 02 2022Record received from Iberia Parish, Louisiana (1 box).
May 04 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 16 2022Rescheduled.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 23 2022Rescheduled.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
May 31 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 06 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 13 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sherry Watters
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana Appellate Project
PO Box 58769 (2411 Leon C.Simon Dr.)
New Orleans, LA 70158-8769

sherrywatters@yahoo.com
5047230284
Party name: Joey Rogers
Attorneys for Respondent
John Taylor Gray
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana Department of Justice
1885 N. 3rd Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

grayj@ag.louisiana.gov
2256146867
Party name: State of Louisiana