No. 21-659
Title:Asociación de Periodistas de Puerto Rico, Petitioner
v.
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Puerto Rico
   Case Numbers:(CT-2021-0008)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 4, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 11 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Asociación de Periodistas de Puerto Rico
Blanket Consent
Nov 23 2021Rule 12.6 Statement of Asociación de Periodistas de Puerto Rico submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Amicus brief of Colegio de Abogados y Abogadas de Puerto Rico submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Schulz
    Counsel of Record
Media Freedom and Information Access Clinic Abrams Institute Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

david.schulz@yale.edu
(203) 436-5827
Party name: Asociación de Periodistas de Puerto Rico
Attorneys for Respondents
Omar Jose Andino Figueroa
    Counsel of Record
Puerto Rico Department of Justice
Teniente Cesar Gonzalez Ave. #677, Floor 5
San Juan, PR 00919

omar.andino@justicia.pr.gov
7873102688
Party name: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Rafael E. Rodriguez Rivera
    Counsel of Record
Legal Aid Clinic, Inter American University of Puerto Rico Law School
170 Calle Federico Costa
San Juan, PR 00918-1303

rrodriguez@juris.inter.edu
7877511912
Party name: Olga E. Costas Rodríguez and Alfonso Ruiz Pérez, next of kin to Andrea Cristina Ruiz Costas
Other
Jessica Esther Mendez
    Counsel of Record
Bufete Emmanuelli, C.S.P.
P.O. Box 10779
Ponce, PR 00732

jessica@emmanuelli.law
787-848-0666
Party name: Colegio de Abogados y Abogadas de Puerto Rico