No. 21-655
Title:Max Ray Butler, Petitioner
v.
S. Porter, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-30029)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2021Waiver of right of respondent S. Porter, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
2727 N. Harwood Street
Dallas, TX 75201

jbaguinaga@jonesday.com
(214) 969-3939
Party name: Max Ray Butler
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: S. Porter, et al.