No. 21-652
Title:Lynette Duncan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Duncan, Deceased, Petitioner
v.
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Docketed:November 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1796)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 2, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Waiver of right of respondent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Randolph Stokes
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher, LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

jstokes@stris.com
213-995-6800
Party name: Lynette Duncan, as personal representative of the estate of David Duncan, deceased
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company