No. 21-6428 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Danny Lee Hill, Petitioner v. Tim Shoop, Warden |
Docketed: | November 24, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (99-4317, 14-3718) |
Decision Date: | August 20, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 18 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2021) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 14 2021 | Brief of respondent Tim Shoop, Warden in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 21 2021 | Reply of petitioner Danny Hill filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 21 2021 | Brief amici curiae of National Disability Rights Network, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 30 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022. |
Jan 06 2022 | Record Requested. |
Jan 18 2022 | Record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. The record is electronic. |
Jan 19 2022 | Record received from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (2 boxes). |
Jan 27 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022. |
Feb 07 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Feb 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022. |
Feb 22 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Feb 28 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022. |
Mar 03 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 14 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022. |
Mar 15 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022. |
Mar 22 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 28 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022. |
Mar 28 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 11 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022. |
Apr 12 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 18 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022. |
Apr 19 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 25 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022. |
Apr 25 2022 | Rescheduled. |
May 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. |
May 10 2022 | Rescheduled. |
May 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022. |
May 16 2022 | Rescheduled. |
May 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022. |
May 23 2022 | Rescheduled. |
May 31 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022. |
May 31 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Jun 06 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022. |
Jun 06 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Jun 13 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022. |
Jun 13 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Jun 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022. |
Jun 23 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Jun 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022. |
Jun 30 2022 | Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Kagan join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) |
Jul 11 2022 | Record returned to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (2 boxes). |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender's Office 1660 West Second Street Suite 750 Cleveland, OH 44113 vicki_werneke@fd.org | 216-861-3926 |
Party name: Danny Hill | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Benjamin Michael Flowers Counsel of Record | Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost 30 E. Broad St. Columbus, OH 43215 benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov | 6144668980 |
Party name: Tim Shoop, Warden | ||
Other | ||
Emily Claire Paavola Counsel of Record | Justice 360 900 Elmwood Ave. Suite 200 Columbia, SC 29201 Emily@justice360sc.org | 8037651044 |
Party name: The National Disability Rights Network, Disability Rights Ohio, Disability Rights Michigan, Disability Rights Tennessee, Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, The Arc of Ohio |