No. 21-641
Title:Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Petitioner
v.
Director, Division of Taxation
Docketed:November 2, 2021
Lower Ct:Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division
   Case Numbers:(A-3904-18T1)
   Decision Date:January 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 1, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.
Blanket Consent
Dec 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent Director, Division of Taxation to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 01 2021Amicus brief of The Institute for Professionals in Taxation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Amicus brief of Energy Infrastructure Council submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Amicus brief of Council On State Taxation submitted.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Amicus brief of The Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, the Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, the New Jersey Chamber of Commerce, the Business Council of New York State, the Ohio Chamber of Commerce, the State Chamber of Oklahoma, the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, and Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Amicus brief of Council On State Taxation submitted.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kyle Oliver Sollie
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1717 Arch Street
Suite 3100
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ksollie@reedsmith.com
(215) 851-8852
Party name: Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael J. Duffy
    Counsel of Record
NJ Dept. Law and Public Safety, Division of Law
25 Market Street
P.O. Box 106
Trenton, NJ 08625-0106

michael.duffy@law.njoag.gov
609-376-2871
Party name: Director, Division of Taxation
Other
Michael James Kerman
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-1101

mkerman@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Institute for Professionals in Taxation
Jonathan Edward Maddison
    Counsel of Record
The Roberts Law Group, PLLC
100 Fisher Avenue, #1160
White Plains, NY 10602

jmaddison@multistatesalt.com
8565206887
Party name: The Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, the Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, the New Jersey Chamber of Commerce, the Business Council of New York State, the Ohio Chamber of Commerce, the State Chamber of Oklahoma, the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, and Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Energy Infrastructure Council
Frederick J. Nicely
    Counsel of Record
Council On State Taxation
122 C Street NW
Suite 330
Washington, DC 20001-2109

fnicely@cost.org
2024845213
Party name: Council On State Taxation