No. 21-637
Title:William Lee, Superintendent, Eastern Correctional Facility, Petitioner
v.
James Garlick
Docketed:November 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1796)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 30, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 1, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 1, 2021 to December 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 3, 2022. See Rule 30.1

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nancy Darragh Killian
    Counsel of Record
Bronx District Atty.'s Office
215 East 161st Street
Bronx, NY 10451

killiann@bronxda.nyc.gov
7188386229
Party name: William Lee
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Joseph Bova
    Counsel of Record
Center for Appellate Litigation
120 Wall Street, 28th Floor
NY, NY 10005

mbova@cfal.org
212-577-2523
Party name: James Garlick