No. 21-634
Title:Zachariah Brian Wright, Petitioner
v.
Indiana
Docketed:November 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(20S-LW-260)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021Motion (21M37) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Oct 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 1, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021MOTION (21M37) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Motion (21M37) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Nov 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Indiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Nov 23 2021Response Requested. (Due December 23, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dortiz@law.virginia.edu
434-924-3127
Party name: Zachariah Brian Wright
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Indiana