No. 21-622
Title:Susan Elaine Devine, Petitioner
v.
Absolute Activist Value Master Fund Limited, et al.
Docketed:October 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10237)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 28, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent Absolute Activist Value Master Fund Limited, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 15 2021Response Requested. (Due December 15, 2021)
Dec 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 14, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ian M. Comisky
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
2000 Market Street
20th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

icomisky@foxrothschild.com
2152992000
Party name: Susan Devine
Attorneys for Respondents
Dwayne Antonio Robinson
    Counsel of Record
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP
2525 Ponce de Leon Blvd.
9th Floor
Miami, FL 33131

drobinson@kttlaw.com
305-372-1800
Party name: Absolute Activist Value Master Fund Limited, et al.