No. 21-605
Vide 21-706
Title:David Lynn Roberson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14654)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 26, 2021 to December 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: David Lynn Roberson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States