No. 21-603
Title:Ohio, Petitioner
v.
George Brinkman
Docketed:October 26, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2019-0303)
   Decision Date:July 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 26, 2021 to December 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Katherine Elizabeth Mullin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cuyahoga County Prosecutor
1200 Ontario Street, 8th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44113

kemullin@prosecutor.cuyahogacounty.us
(216) 698-6454
Party name: Ohio
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey M. Gamso
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jeffrey M. Gamso
1252 Homestead Road
South Euclid, OH 44121-3562

jeff.gamso@gmail.com
419-340-4600
Party name: George Brinkman
Other
Steven L. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Prosecuting Attys. Assn.
196 East State Street, Suite 200
Columbus, OH 43215

taylor@ohiopa.org
614-221-1266
Party name: Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association