No. 21-6001 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Terence Tramaine Andrus, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:October 19, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-84,438-01)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 18, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Children's Defense Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Eight Million Stories, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021Brief amici curiae of National Alliance on Mental Illness, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Texas Catholic Conference of Bishops filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Rebecca A. Betts, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Advocates for Child Victims of Domestic Violence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021Reply of petitioner Terence Andrus filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 14 2021Record Requested.
Dec 21 2021Record received from the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals. The record is electronic and contains sealed materials.
Dec 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 04 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 18 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 11 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 22 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 01 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 16 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gretchen S. Sween
    Counsel of Record
Sween Law
PO Box 5083
Austin, TX 78763-5083

gsweenlaw@gmail.com
214.557.5779
Party name: Terence Andrus
Attorneys for Respondent
Charann Ellesse Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Fort Bend County District Attorney's Office
301 Jackson Street
Richmond, TX 77469

charann.thompson@fortbendcountytx.gov
281-341-4460
Party name: Texas
Other
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Advocates for Child Victims of Domestic Violence
Peter D. Keisler
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

pkeisler@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8027
Party name: National Alliance on Mental Illness and National Association of Social Workers
Nicole Susanne LeFave
    Counsel of Record
Littler Mendelson. P.C.
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1400
Austin, TX 78701

nlefave@littler.com
5129827261
Party name: Eight Million Stories and Lone Star Justice Alliance
Marisa Christina Maleck
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

mmaleck@kslaw.com
(202) 737-0500
Party name: Texas Catholic Conference of Bishops
Mae Catherine Quinn
    Counsel of Record
UDC David A. Clarke School of Law
Youth Justice Clinic
4340 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20008-2315

mae.quinn@udc.edu
3143302245
Party name: Children's Defense Fund, et al.
LaRue Lawrence Robinson
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
300 N. LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60654

lrobinson@willkie.com
312-728-9022
Party name: Rebecca A. Betts, James S. Brady, Michael Dettmer, Terry Pechota, Richard J. Pocker, Colonel Robert F. Resnick (Ret.), and Benito Romano
Reginald M. Turner Jr.
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicao, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association