No. 21-599 | |
Title: | Margaret L. Kinney, Petitioner v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. |
Docketed: | October 26, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1122) |
Decision Date: | July 23, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 20 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 19 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 23 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021. |
Dec 02 2021 | Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2022) |
Dec 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2022 to February 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2022. |
Feb 01 2022 | Brief of respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022. |
Mar 07 2022 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
Aug 30 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 06 2022 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Margaret Kinney filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 14 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022. |
Sep 14 2022 | Supplemental brief of respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 11 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Blvd. Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 taylor@consovoymccarthy.com | 703-243-9423 |
Party name: Margaret Kinney | ||
Stephen Edward Berken | Berken Cloyes, P.C. 1159 Delaware Street Denver, CO 80204 stephenberkenlaw@gmail.com | 3036234357 |
Party name: Margaret Kinney | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jamie Grant Siler Counsel of Record | Murr Siler & Accomazzo, P.C. 1999 Broadway, Suite 3100 Denver, CO 80202 jsiler@bmas.com | 3035342277 |
Party name: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. | ||
Other | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |