No. 21-581
Title:Allen H. Loughry, II, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4137)
   Decision Date:May 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2021 to December 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Allen H Loughry
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America