No. 21-577
Title:Fredric N. Eshelman, Petitioner
v.
Puma Biotechnology, Inc.
Docketed:October 20, 2021
Linked with 21A14
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1329, 20-1376)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2021Application (21A14) for a stay of mandate, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 04 2021Letter of applicant Fredric N. Eshelman filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2021UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, case Nos. 20-1329 and 20-1376, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Wednesday, August 11, 2021, by 3:00 p.m. ET, and further order of the undersigned or of the Court.
Aug 11 2021Response to application from respondent Puma Biotechnology, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 12 2021Reply of applicant Fredric N. Eshelman filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Aug 13 2021Application (21A14) denied by The Chief Justice. The order heretofore issued by The Chief Justice on August 4, 2021, is vacated. The application for a stay of mandate is, in all respects, denied.
Oct 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Waiver of right of respondent Puma Biotechnology, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Marie Locke
    Counsel of Record
Clare Locke LLP
10 Prince Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

libby@clarelocke.com
202-628-7402
Party name: Fredric N. Eshelman
Attorneys for Respondent
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Puma Biotechnology, Inc.