No. 21-57
Title:Levi Frasier, Petitioner
v.
Christopher L. Evans, et al.
Docketed:July 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1015)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Levi Frasier submitted.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Levi Frasier