No. 21-568
Title:Jason Jarvis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3912)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Nov 17 2021Brief amici curiae of FAMM and NACDL filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Jason Jarvis
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: The United States of America
Other
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, 63rd Floor
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: FAMM and NACDL