No. 21-552
Title:Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
Edward Anderson, et al.
Docketed:October 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17520)
   Decision Date:March 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 14, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2021 to December 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2021.
Nov 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Forrest Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Bennett LLP
7733 Forsyth Boulevard
Suite 19
St. Louis, MO 63105

jbennett@dowdbennett.com
314-889-7300
Party name: Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
2117 Leroy Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: Edward Anderson, et al.
Michael Davitt MurphyFranklin D. Azar & Associates, P.C.
14426 East Evans Avenue
Aurora, CO 80014

murphym@fdazar.com
3037573300
Party name: Edward Anderson, et al.
Other
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, the Chamber of Commerce, and the Financial Services institute