No. 21-551
Title:John J. Watford, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 14, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1361)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2021 to December 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2021.
Nov 12 2021Brief amici curiae of FAMM and NACDL filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Brief amici curiae of American Conservative Union Foundation Nolan Center for Justice and the Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: John J. Watford
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, 63rd Floor
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: FAMM and NACDL
John Savage Moran
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jmoran@mcguirewoods.com
(202) 828-2817
Party name: American Conservative Union Foundation Nolan Center for Justice and the Cato Institute