No. 21-541
Title:Travis Tuggle, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2352)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2021.
Nov 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 15 Media Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Brief amici curiae of American Islamic Congress and Muslim Public Affairs Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2021 to January 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 12, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Travis Tuggle
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 15 Media Organizations
Jennifer Lynch
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

jlynch@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, Brennan Center for Justice, Center for Democracy & Technology, Electronic Privacy Information Center, and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Joshua Craig McDaniel
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School Religious Freedom Clinic
1585 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

jmcdaniel@law.harvard.edu
6179981593
Party name: American Islamic Congress, Muslim Public Affairs Council
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute and The Rutherford Institute
Joshua Aaron Windham
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jwindham@ij.org
7047121490
Party name: Institute for Justice
Owen Dennis Yeates
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Ave NW
Ste 801
Washington, DC 20036

oyeates@ifs.org
202-301-3300
Party name: Institute for Free Speech